FL H1315 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-236; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemptions from public records requirements for secure login credentials, Internet protocol addresses, geolocation data, & other certain information held by DHSMV; provides retroactive application; provides for future legislative review & repeal; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#250 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06 Chapter No. 2021-236; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235)
2021-06-29 Approved by Governor
2021-06-28 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-22HouseOrdered enrolled
2021-04-22HouseIn Messages
2021-04-22SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-22SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1326
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-22SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2021-04-21SenateReceived
2021-04-21HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-21SenateReferred to Rules
2021-04-21SenateIn Messages
2021-04-21HouseCS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-15HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021)
2021-04-14HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-14HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-04-14HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-14HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2021-04-12HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-04-02HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-04-02HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-31House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-31HouseCS Filed
2021-03-31HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-31HouseReported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseFavorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-26HouseAdded to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-22HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseFavorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-18HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-05HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1313 (Related) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-235; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236)
S1326 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236), CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235)
S1324 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235), CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1190712Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/Amendment/817631/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/Analyses/h1315.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/Analyses/h1315a.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/Analyses/h1315b.GOS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/Analyses/h1315c.GOS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/Analyses/h1315d.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/Analyses/h1315e.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/Analyses/h1315z.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/Analyses/h1315z1.TIE.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/Vote/HouseVote_h01315c1250.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1315/Vote/SenateVote_h01315c1031.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58984&IsPCB=0&BillId=72481
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59609&IsPCB=0&BillId=72481
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60299&IsPCB=0&BillId=72481

Bill Comments 750

feedback