FL S1324 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235), CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235), CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to establish a secure and uniform system for issuing optional digital proofs of driver licenses and identification cards; authorizing the department to contract with one or more private entities to develop an electronic credentialing system; authorizing the department to enter into contracts with private entities for a specified purpose; prohibiting entities from storing, selling, or sharing personal information collected from scanning the digital proofs of driver licenses and identification cards, etc.
Title
Digital Driver Licenses and Identification Cards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235), CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1313 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations; Rules |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1326 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236), CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235)
H1313 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-235; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236)
H1315 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-236; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235)
H1313 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-235; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236)
H1315 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-236; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |