FL S0414 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 387
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating a uniform annual use fee collected for a specialty license plate unless otherwise specified; adding annual use fees for certain specialty license plates, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees/Specialty License Plates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 387
2020-03-12SenateSubstituted CS/HB 387
2020-03-12SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-11SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-10SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-09SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-06SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-04SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-04SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-03-03SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/13/20, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-06SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-03SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-10-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S412 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1135
S862 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1500 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1135 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
H387 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Ordered enrolled
H385 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback