FL S0862 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring an organization that seeks authorization to establish a new specialty license plate for which an annual use fee is to be charged to submit to the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles an application fee, subject to certain requirements; requiring requests for certain specialty license plates to include an annual use fee of a specified amount unless the amount is otherwise specified for a particular plate, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees/Specialty License Plates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Infrastructure and Security
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-11-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S860 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S414 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 387
S1500 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H387 (Similar To) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-176, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1135 (Ch. 2020-181)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback