WA SB5588 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the mental health sentencing alternative.
Title
Concerning the mental health sentencing alternative.
Sponsors
Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 373, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2024-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | House | Committee amendment |
2024-03-01 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2024-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-02-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-20 | House | CSJR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 4:00 PM. |
2024-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |