FL S1500 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing a license plate annual use fee for the Blue Angels license plate; providing a license plate annual use fee to be collected for specialty license plates created or established after a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plate Fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied on Calendar
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-12SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/12/20
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-03SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-19SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/18/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-01-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-21SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2020-01-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S412 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1135
S414 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 387
S862 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H1135 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S488 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H387 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback