MS HB1855 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt From Sales Taxation Sales, Leases Or Other Retail Transfers Of Fixed-wing Aircraft To, Or To Be Used By, Certified Common Carriers In The Transport Of Persons Or Property In Interstate, Intrastate Or Foreign Commerce, And Engines, Accessories And Spare Parts For Such Fixed-wing Aircraft; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales tax; exempt sales, leases or other retail transfers of certain fixed-wing aircraft.
Sponsors
Rep. Karl Oliver [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2024-03-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2024-03-27 | House | Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |