FL H0387 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-176, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1135 (Ch. 2020-181)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for collection of a uniform annual use fee for a specialty license plate unless otherwise specified, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License Plate Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#525 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21 Chapter No. 2020-176, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1135 (Ch. 2020-181)
2020-09-18 Approved by Governor
2020-09-04 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-12SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-12SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-12SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-12SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 414
2020-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-12SenateWithdrawn from Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2020-03-05SenateReceived
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2020-03-04SenateIn Messages
2020-03-04HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2020-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-03HouseAmendment(s) adopted (925803)
2020-03-03HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-13HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2020-02-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/13/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-28HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-01-28HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2020-01-22HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-22HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-21HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-21HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-01-16HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-23HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-10-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H385 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
S412 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1135
S1456 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1454 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H1135 (Related) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-181, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 387 (Ch. 2020-176)
S414 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 387
S862 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1500 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback