FL H0385 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs DHSMV to develop Highwaymen license plate; provides for distribution & use of fees collected from sale of plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-23HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-10-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H387 (Related) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-176, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1135 (Ch. 2020-181)
S412 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1135
S1454 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1456 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H1135 (Similar To) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-181, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 387 (Ch. 2020-176)
S414 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 387

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback