FL H1135 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-181, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 387 (Ch. 2020-176)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing election of a permanent registration period for certain vehicles if certain conditions are met; revising presale requirements for issuance of a specialty license plate; prohibiting annual use fees received by any entity from being used for certain purposes; requiring that certain documentation be on file with the department prior to the development of certain license plates, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License Plates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#754 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#524 (Y: 78 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21 Chapter No. 2020-181, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 387 (Ch. 2020-176)
2020-09-18 Approved by Governor
2020-09-04 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-13HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-13HousePassed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2020-03-13HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (235304) 1186
2020-03-12HouseIn returning messages
2020-03-12SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-12SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-12SenatePending amendment(s), adopted as amended (235304)
2020-03-12SenatePending amendment(s), withdrawn (409002)
2020-03-11SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-11SenateTemporarily postponed
2020-03-11SenateAmendment(s) pending (409002, 464008)
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-11SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 412
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-11SenateWithdrawn from Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2020-03-05SenateReceived
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2020-03-04SenateIn Messages
2020-03-04HousePassed as amended; YEAS 78 NAYS 40
2020-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-03HouseAmendment(s) adopted (194987, 978535)
2020-03-03HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-13HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1
2020-02-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/13/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-28HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-01-28HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2020-01-21HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-21HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 2
2020-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2020-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H387 (Related) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-176, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1135 (Ch. 2020-181)
S412 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1135
H27 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
H385 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
S108 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S414 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 387
S860 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1454 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1500 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H29 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
H873 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
H875 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
S110 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S568 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S570 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1456 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200657Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008068Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200875Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200891Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200894Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback