FL H5001 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides moneys for annual period beginning July 1, 2018, & ending June 30, 2019, & supplemental appropriations for period ending June 30, 2018, to pay salaries & other expenses, capital outlay-buildings & other improvements, & for other specified purposes of various agencies of state government.
Title
General Appropriations Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#912 (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#578 (Y: 85 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#571 (Y: 39 N: 72 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#912 (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#578 (Y: 85 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#571 (Y: 39 N: 72 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Chapter No. 2018-9 | |
2018-03-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-16 | Governor vetoed specific Line Item(s) | |
2018-03-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-11 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2018-03-11 | Senate | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 31 NAYS 5 1278 |
2018-03-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report adopted (616813) |
2018-03-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report received |
2018-03-11 | Senate | In returning messages |
2018-03-11 | House | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 95 NAYS 12 |
2018-03-11 | House | Conference Committee Report adopted (616813) 1396 |
2018-03-11 | House | Conference Committee Report considered |
2018-02-27 | House | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Trujillo (Chair), Berman (At Large), Bileca (At Large), Boyd (At Large), Caldwell (At Large), Cruz (At Large), Cummings (At Large), DuBose (At Large), Eagle (At Large), Edwards-Walpole (At Large), Jones (At Large), Metz (At Large), Moraitis (At Large), Moskowitz (At Large), Nunez (At Large), Oliva (At Large), Raschein (At Large), Renner (At Large), Richardson (At Large), Rodrigues (At Large), Sprowls (At Large), Stafford (At Large), Stark (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources/Environment and Natural Resources: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Clemons, Diamond, Fitzenhagen, Goodson, Harrison, Henry, Jacobs, Raschein, Roth, Slosberg, Stone, Watson, C., Williamson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Governmental Operations and Technology/General Government: Ingoglia (Chair), Altman, Antone, Cortes, J., Davis, DuBose, Eagle, Fant, McClure, Plasencia, Shaw, Stone, Sullivan, Willhite, Yarborough; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health Care/Health and Human Services: Brodeur (Chair), Burgess, Burton, Duran, Grall, Grant, J., Harrell, Jones, Magar, Mercado, Pigman, Richardson, Stevenson, White; Appropriations Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Ahern (Chair), Alexander, Avila, Cortes, B., Drake, Edwards-Walpole, Gonzalez, Good, Lee, Leek, Mariano, Perez, Ponder, Porter, Rodrigues, Silvers, Smith; Appropriations Conference Committee on Justice/Criminal and Civil Justice: Hager (Chair), Abruzzo, Asencio, Byrd, Daniels, Fitzenhagen, Grant, J., Gruters, Miller, M., Peters, Plakon, Pritchett, Spano, Toledo, Williams; Appropriations Conference Committee on Pre K-12 Education/PreK-12 Education: Diaz, M (Chair), Antone, Brown, Donalds, Fischer, Hardemon, Latvala, Lee, Massullo, McClain, Newton, Olszewski, Payne, Raburn, Russell, Sullivan; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation and Tourism/Transportation, Tourism and Economic Development: Ingram (Chair), Beshears, Cortes, B., Drake, Fine, Geller, Grant, M., Jacquet, Jenne, Killebrew, La Rosa, McGhee, Rommel, Santiago, Trumbull, Watson, B. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Bradley (Chair), Flores (Vice Chair), Baxley (At Large), Bean (At Large), Benacquisto (At Large), Braynon (At Large), Galvano (At Large), Grimsley (At Large), Montford (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Simpson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Brandes (Chair), Baxley, Bean, Bracy, Flores, Perry, Rodriguez; Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government/Governmental Operations and Technology: Simmons (Chair), Bean, Broxson, Campbell, Gainer, Garcia, Mayfield, Powell, Rodriguez, Taddeo, Torres; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Flores (Chair), Baxley, Book, Passidomo, Rader, Rouson, Stargel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Galvano (Chair), Bradley, Farmer, Lee, Perry, Simpson, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Pre-K - 12 Education/Pre K - 12 Education: Passidomo (Chair), Broxson, Farmer, Grimsley, Lee, Montford, Rouson, Steube, Young; Appropriations Conference Committee on the Environment and Natural Resources/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Book (Chair), Braynon, Garcia, Hukill, Hutson, Mayfield, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Transportation and Tourism: Simpson (Chair), Benacquisto, Bradley, Gainer, Galvano, Gibson, Powell, Rader, Stargel, Thurston |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee) |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee) |
2018-02-08 | House | In returning messages |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The Senate having refused to pass the bill as passed by the House, acceded to the request for a conference |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (139720) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Substituted for SB 2500 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-08 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-02-08 | House | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2018-02-08 | House | Immediately certified |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed; YEAS 85 NAYS 27 |
2018-02-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Amendment(s) failed (990010) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced |
2018-02-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/18 |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2500 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
H517 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
H5003 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-10
H5005 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-11
H5007 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-12
H5201 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H5203 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H5301 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6
S2502 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003
S2504 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5005
S7014 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5007
H517 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
H5003 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-10
H5005 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-11
H5007 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-12
H5201 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H5203 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H5301 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6
S2502 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003
S2504 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5005
S7014 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5007