CA AB3234 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 438, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 438, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 1250) to Part 4 of Division 2 of the Labor Code, relating to private employment.
Title
Employers: social compliance audit.
Sponsors
Asm. Liz Ortega [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-26 - Assembly - AB 3234 Ortega Concurrence in Senate Amendments By KALRA (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3234 Ortega By Cortese (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Assembly - AB 3234 Ortega Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3234 Ortega By Cortese (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Assembly - AB 3234 Ortega Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 438, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5162.) |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1250 | New Code | See Bill Text |