FL H5005 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for the resolution of specific collective bargaining issues at impasse between the State of Florida and certified bargaining units of state employees; providing for all other mandatory collective bargaining issues at impasse that are not specifically addressed by this act or the General Appropriations Act to be resolved consistent with personnel rules and by otherwise maintaining the status quo, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collective Bargaining

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#914 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#580 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20 Chapter No. 2018-11
2018-03-16 Approved by Governor
2018-03-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-11HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-11SenatePassed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 34 NAYS 0
2018-03-11SenateConference Committee Report adopted (217001)
2018-03-11SenateConference Committee Report received
2018-03-11SenateIn returning messages
2018-03-11HousePassed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 108 NAYS 0
2018-03-11HouseConference Committee Report adopted (217001)
2018-03-11HouseConference Committee Report considered
2018-02-27HouseConference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Trujillo (Chair), Berman (At Large), Bileca (At Large), Boyd (At Large), Caldwell (At Large), Cruz (At Large), Cummings (At Large), DuBose (At Large), Eagle (At Large), Edwards-Walpole (At Large), Jones (At Large), Metz (At Large), Moraitis (At Large), Moskowitz (At Large), Nunez (At Large), Oliva (At Large), Raschein (At Large), Renner (At Large), Richardson (At Large), Rodrigues (At Large), Sprowls (At Large), Stafford (At Large), Stark (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources/Environment and Natural Resources: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Clemons, Diamond, Fitzenhagen, Goodson, Harrison, Henry, Jacobs, Raschein, Roth, Slosberg, Stone, Watson, C., Williamson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Governmental Operations and Technology/General Government: Ingoglia (Chair), Altman, Antone, Cortes, J., Davis, DuBose, Eagle, Fant, McClure, Plasencia, Shaw, Stone, Sullivan, Willhite, Yarborough; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health Care/Health and Human Services: Brodeur (Chair), Burgess, Burton, Duran, Grall, Grant, J., Harrell, Jones, Magar, Mercado, Pigman, Richardson, Stevenson, White; Appropriations Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Ahern (Chair), Alexander, Avila, Cortes, B., Drake, Edwards-Walpole, Gonzalez, Good, Lee, Leek, Mariano, Perez, Ponder, Porter, Rodrigues, Silvers, Smith; Appropriations Conference Committee on Justice/Criminal and Civil Justice: Hager (Chair), Abruzzo, Asencio, Byrd, Daniels, Fitzenhagen, Grant, J., Gruters, Miller, M., Peters, Plakon, Pritchett, Spano, Toledo, Williams; Appropriations Conference Committee on Pre K-12 Education/PreK-12 Education: Diaz, M (Chair), Antone, Brown, Donalds, Fischer, Hardemon, Latvala, Lee, Massullo, McClain, Newton, Olszewski, Payne, Raburn, Russell, Sullivan; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation and Tourism/Transportation, Tourism and Economic Development: Ingram (Chair), Beshears, Cortes, B., Drake, Fine, Geller, Grant, M., Jacquet, Jenne, Killebrew, La Rosa, McGhee, Rommel, Santiago, Trumbull, Watson, B.
2018-02-27SenateConference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Bradley (Chair), Flores (Vice Chair), Baxley (At Large), Bean (At Large), Benacquisto (At Large), Braynon (At Large), Galvano (At Large), Grimsley (At Large), Montford (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Simpson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Brandes (Chair), Baxley, Bean, Bracy, Flores, Perry, Rodriguez; Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government/Governmental Operations and Technology: Simmons (Chair), Bean, Broxson, Campbell, Gainer, Garcia, Mayfield, Powell, Rodriguez, Taddeo, Torres; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Flores (Chair), Baxley, Book, Passidomo, Rader, Rouson, Stargel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Galvano (Chair), Bradley, Farmer, Lee, Perry, Simpson, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Pre-K - 12 Education/Pre K - 12 Education: Passidomo (Chair), Broxson, Farmer, Grimsley, Lee, Montford, Rouson, Steube, Young; Appropriations Conference Committee on the Environment and Natural Resources/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Book (Chair), Braynon, Garcia, Hukill, Hutson, Mayfield, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Transportation and Tourism: Simpson (Chair), Benacquisto, Bradley, Gainer, Galvano, Gibson, Powell, Rader, Stargel, Thurston
2018-02-27SenateBill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee)
2018-02-27HouseBill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee)
2018-02-08HouseIn returning messages
2018-02-08SenateImmediately certified
2018-02-08SenateThe Senate having refused to pass the bill as passed by the House, acceded to the request for a conference
2018-02-08SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 0
2018-02-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (926324)
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-08SenateSubstituted for SB 2504
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-08SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateReceived
2018-02-08SenateIn Messages
2018-02-08HouseRequests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference
2018-02-08HouseImmediately certified
2018-02-08HousePassed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0
2018-02-08HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-07HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-07HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-01HouseIntroduced
2018-02-01HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/18
2018-02-01HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-02-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2504 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5005
H5001 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-9
S2500 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback