NE LB4 | 2024 | 108th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-21 - Approved by the Governor on August 20, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-21 - Approved by the Governor on August 20, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds for special session expenses
Title
Appropriate funds for special session expenses
Sponsors
Sen. John Arch [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-3-5 (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-08-08 - Legislature - Conrad MO94 failed (Y: 3 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-08-08 - Legislature - Speaker Arch MO123 prevailed (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Legislature - Hunt AM46 lost (Y: 11 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-08-07 - Legislature - Speaker Arch MO120 prevailed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-08 - Legislature - Conrad MO94 failed (Y: 3 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-08-08 - Legislature - Speaker Arch MO123 prevailed (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Legislature - Hunt AM46 lost (Y: 11 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-08-07 - Legislature - Speaker Arch MO120 prevailed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-21 | Legislature | Approved by the Governor on August 20, 2024 |
2024-08-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 20, 2024 |
2024-08-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-08-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-3-5 |
2024-08-20 | Legislature | Conrad FA73 withdrawn |
2024-08-20 | Legislature | Conrad FA72 withdrawn |
2024-08-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, J. MO121 not considered |
2024-08-20 | Legislature | Conrad MO95 not considered |
2024-08-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-08-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-08-08 | Legislature | Conrad MO94 failed |
2024-08-08 | Legislature | Speaker Arch MO123 prevailed |
2024-08-08 | Legislature | Speaker Arch MO123 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed |
2024-08-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, J. MO121 Bracket until August 13, 2024 filed |
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Hunt AM46 lost |
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Speaker Arch MO120 prevailed |
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Speaker Arch MO120 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed |
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Hunt AM46 filed |
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Conrad MO91 withdrawn |
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Conrad MO91 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Conrad FA73 filed |
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Conrad FA72 filed |
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Conrad MO95 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2024-08-07 | Legislature | Conrad MO94 Bracket until January 7, 2025 filed |
2024-07-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2024-07-25 | Legislature | Date of introduction |