FL H0517 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DMS to implement formulary management cost-saving measures; provides requirements for such measures; removes provision that prohibits department from implementing restricted prescription drug formulary or prior authorization program in state employees' prescription drug program.
Title
State Employees' Prescription Drug Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#582 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-02-08 | House | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2018-02-08 | House | Immediately certified |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 542 |
2018-02-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/18 |
2018-01-24 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18 |
2018-01-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-09 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 28 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/09/18, 4:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-12-05 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-05 | House | Favorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 12/05/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S954 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H5001 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-9
S2500 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
H5001 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-9
S2500 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001