FL H1553 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Governor to proclaim November 7 of each year as "Victims of Communism Day"; requires day to be observed in public schools; requires certain high school students to receive specified instruction.
Title
Victims of Communism Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#41 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#101 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#101 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in returning Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158) |
2021-04-21 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (133526) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 490 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-14 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-13 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021) |
2021-03-29 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2021-03-22 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Original reference removed: Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Original reference removed: State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-19 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-15 | House | PCS added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1606 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158)
H5 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-158
S1450 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158)
S490 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table
H5 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-158
S1450 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158)
S490 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table