FL S1450 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the social studies high school graduation credit requirement; requiring the Department of Education to develop or approve an integrated civic education curriculum that meets certain requirements; requiring the department to curate oral history resources to be used along with such curriculum; designating the "Portraits in Patriotism Act", etc.
Title
Civic Education Curriculum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted HB 5 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 03/17/21, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/09/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H5 (Same As) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-158
H1553 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158)
S1606 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158)
H1553 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158)
S1606 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 4282 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |