FL S0490 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designating Juneteenth Day as a legal holiday; repealing a provision relating to Juneteenth Day; deleting provisions designating Juneteenth Day as a special observance, to conform to changes made by the act, etc.
Title
Juneteenth Day
Sponsors
Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Sen. Randolph Bracy [D] | Sen. Linda Stewart [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Laid on Table |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1553 (Died in returning Messages) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Rules |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations |
2021-03-18 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/17/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations; Rules |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H185 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
H1553 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158)
H1553 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2021-158)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
683 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
683 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |