OK HB3598 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; defining terms; cameras; policies and procedures; requirements for peace officers who utilize certain cameras; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; defining terms; cameras; policies and procedures; requirements for peace officers who utilize certain cameras; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 20 |
2024-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2024-02-15 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Remove Representative Hill as principal House author and substitute with Representative Ford |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |