FL H1365 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that Secretary of State shall be elected; provides that person may register to vote & cast ballot on election day; provides that General Election Day is paid holiday; requires Division of Elections to maintain strategic elections equipment reserve; provides that person may cast provisional vote in the county in which voter claims to be registered; revises provisions relating to vote-by-mail ballots; prohibits certain persons from serving on Elections Canvassing Commission or county canvassing board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1802 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S1386 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S7066 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-162
H7101 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101048Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1015612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10164Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101657Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10168Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10169Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1016952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101697Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
970555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
970556Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
970575Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
980981Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback