FL S7066 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-162
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of State to provide signature matching training to certain persons; revising the voter threshold necessary to require the reporting of certain precinct-level results by ballot; requiring the supervisor of elections of the county in which an ineligible voter is registered to notify the voter of instructions for seeking restoration of voting rights pursuant to s. 4, Art. VI of the State Constitution, in addition to restoration of civil rights pursuant to s. 8, Art. IV of the State Constitution; requiring the supervisor of elections to make a final determination of whether a person who has been convicted of a felony offense is eligible to register to vote, including if he or she has completed all the terms of his or her sentence, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Administration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#372 (Y: 67 N: 42 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#327 (Y: 101 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#40 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Chapter No. 2019-162
2019-06-28 Approved by Governor
2019-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-03HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 67 NAYS 42
2019-05-03HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) to House amendment(s) (766844) 1263
2019-05-02HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-02SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 22 NAYS 17
2019-05-02SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) as amended (704217)
2019-05-02SenateAmendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (766844)
2019-05-01SenateIn returning messages
2019-05-01HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 101 NAYS 13
2019-05-01HouseAmendment(s) adopted (704217)
2019-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HouseReceived
2019-04-29HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-26HouseIn Messages
2019-04-26SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 1
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-26SenateOrdered engrossed
2019-04-26SenateAmendment(s) adopted (842530)
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-25SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2019-04-24SenateCS by Rules read 1st time
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-23SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-23SenateCS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 1
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Rules
2019-03-06SenateFiled
2019-03-05SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-28SenateSubmitted for consideration by Ethics and Elections

Same As/Similar To

H967 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
H1365 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S460 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S1386 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S1802 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
H7101 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
H689 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S268 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
H7089 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S7086 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101048Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10156075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1015614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10164Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101657Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10168Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10169Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1016923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102168Amended CodeSee Bill Text
104011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
104051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
940061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94724Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95129Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
980751Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
980981Amended CodeSee Bill Text
99063Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/Amendment/415328/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/Amendment/843216/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/Amendment/854810/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/Amendment/651506/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/Amendment/597510/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/Amendment/842530/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/Vote/SenateVote_s07066c1005.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/Vote/SenateVote_s07066c1040.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/Vote/HouseVote_s07066e1327.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/Vote/SenateVote_s07066e1031.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7066/Vote/HouseVote_s07066e1372.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback