FL S1802 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the statewide election of the Secretary of State; requiring the Secretary of State to provide signature matching training to supervisors of elections and county canvassing boards; providing that General Election Day is a paid holiday; authorizing a person to cast a provisional vote in the county in which the voter claims to be registered; requiring a supervisor of elections to annually conduct specified tests of voting systems; removing the requirement that absent electors' ballots must be received by the supervisor by a specified time on the day of the election, etc.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1386 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
H1365 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S7066 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-162
H7101 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
H1365 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S7066 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-162
H7101 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
100 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 697 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0556 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 0981 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1802 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1802/BillText/Filed/HTML |