FL H7101 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Secretary of State to provide signature matching training; revises deadlines for voter signature updates for purposes of vote-by-mail & provisional ballots; revises date of primary election; provides requirements for canvassing & counting of vote-by-mail & provisional ballots; revises requirements for department rules governing ballot design; revises size of areas in which voter solicitation is prohibited; provides notice requirements for meetings of county canvassing board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
2019-04-30HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2019-04-29HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2019-04-26HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2019-04-25HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-25HouseAmendment(s) adopted (692699) 905
2019-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-01HouseCS by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee read 1st time
2019-03-29HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-28HouseCS by- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 4
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2019-03-25HouseIntroduced
2019-03-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H967 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
H1365 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S460 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S1802 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S7066 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-162
H689 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S268 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)
S1386 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7066 (Ch. 2019-162)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101048Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10156075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1015614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10164Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101657Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10168Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10169Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1016923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102168Amended CodeSee Bill Text
104051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
980981Amended CodeSee Bill Text
99061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
99063Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/613119/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/518505/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/726275/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/051365/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/398787/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/970869/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/162863/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/458331/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/756865/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/142093/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/017051/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/553993/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/382327/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/524799/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/416671/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/433699/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/617777/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/882913/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/386421/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/083075/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/800563/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/485025/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/692699/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/654021/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7101/Amendment/311341/PDF

Bill Comments

feedback