FL H0221 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creates "Ronshay Dugans Act"; designates Drowsy Driving Prevention Week; encourages DHSMV & DOT to educate law enforcement community & public about relationship between fatigue & driving performance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drowsy Driving Prevention

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
2010-03-24 Original reference(s) removed: PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; CS referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00395; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-03-23 CS read 1st time on 03/23/10 -HJ 00372; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-17 CS by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00379
2010-03-15 PCS on Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 03/17/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00027; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, 404-H --Workshopped
2010-02-10 On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, 404-H --Workshopped
2009-11-01 Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-10-13 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0041 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
H0323 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0333 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0687 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0324 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0326 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0328 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0374 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0418 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0448 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0608 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0934 (Similar To) 2010-01-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1144 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S2514 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
H0971 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-223; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 263 (Ch. 2010-82), CS/CS/CS/HB 631 (Ch. 2010-198), CS/HB 795 (Ch. 2010-107)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
03166152Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback