FL S0608 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the use of a cellular telephone while operating a motor vehicle except when using a headset or hands-free device. Provides exemptions. Provides a penalty. Provides for enforcement only as a secondary offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cellular Telephones/Use While Driving [CPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Transportation
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Transportation; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00047
2009-12-17 Referred to Transportation; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations
2009-11-04 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0221 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
H0687 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0893 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0244 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0418 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0592 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0934 (Similar To) 2010-01-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1144 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
H0333 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S2514 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback