FL S2514 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits reading, writing, or using a wireless communications device for text messaging while driving a motor vehicle. Provides exceptions. Prohibits the use of a wireless telephone while driving a motor vehicle unless the telephone is designed and used for hands-free talking and listening. Prohibits operators of school buses or other public transportation vehicles from operating such vehicles while using a wireless telephone, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wireless Communications Devices in Motor Vehicles [CPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Transportation
2010-03-11 Introduced -SJ 00215
2010-03-04 Referred to Transportation; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00215
2010-02-26 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0041 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
H0221 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
H0323 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0333 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0893 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0168 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0244 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0324 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0326 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0328 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0374 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0448 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0592 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0608 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S1144 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S0934 (Similar To) 2010-01-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback