FL S1144 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the "Ronshay Dugans Act." Designates Drowsy Driving Prevention Week. Encourages the HSMV and the DOT to educate the law enforcement community and the public about the relationship between fatigue and driving performance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driving Safety/Ronshay Dugans Act [CPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
2010-04-27 Withdrawn from- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00892; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2010-04-26 Withdrawn from- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities -SJ 00863
2010-04-02 On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 301-S --If received --Meeting cancelled
2010-03-29 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-03-24 CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00350; CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -SJ 00355
2010-03-19 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/24/10, 1:15 pm, 37-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Transportation; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00081
2010-01-20 Referred to Transportation; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations
2010-01-12 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0041 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
H0323 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0333 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0687 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0324 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0326 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0328 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0374 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0418 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0448 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0608 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0934 (Similar To) 2010-01-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H0221 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S2514 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
H0971 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-223; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 263 (Ch. 2010-82), CS/CS/CS/HB 631 (Ch. 2010-198), CS/HB 795 (Ch. 2010-107)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
03166152Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback