FL S0448 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the "Florida Ban on Texting While Driving Law." Prohibits the operation of a motor vehicle while using a wireless communications device for certain purposes. Provides for points to be assessed against a driver's license for the unlawful use of a wireless communications device resulting in a crash, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wireless Communications Device/Driving [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0008 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Messages
2010-04-27 In Messages
2010-04-27 Read 3rd time -SJ 00886; CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 4 -SJ 00886
2010-04-26 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00852
2010-04-19 Favorable by- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00651; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00651
2010-04-14 Favorable by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 -SJ 00599; Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00599; On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 309-C
2010-04-09 On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 04/14/10, 9:30 am, 301-S
2010-04-02 On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 301-S --Meeting cancelled
2010-03-30 Now in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities -SJ 00344
2010-03-25 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-03-24 CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00344; CS read 1st time on 03/25/10 -SJ 00345
2010-03-19 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/24/10, 1:15 pm, 37-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Transportation; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00039
2009-12-09 Referred to Transportation; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations
2009-10-14 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0221 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
H0323 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0893 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0168 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0244 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0324 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0326 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0328 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0374 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0592 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0934 (Similar To) 2010-01-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1144 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
H0041 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
S2514 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0316304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032227Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback