FL H0041 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creates "Florida Ban on Texting While Driving Law"; prohibits operation of motor vehicle while using wireless communications device for certain purposes; provides for enforcement as secondary action; provides for assessment of points against driver's license for unlawful use of wireless communications device resulting in crash.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of Wireless Communications Device/Driving

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Finance & Tax Council
2010-03-16 Original reference(s) removed: Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); CS referred to Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00300; Now in Finance & Tax Council
2010-03-15 CS read 1st time on 03/15/10 -HJ 00276; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-10 CS by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00280
2010-03-08 PCS on Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 03/10/10, 8:30 am, 404-H
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00012; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, 404-H --Workshopped
2010-02-10 On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 9:00 am, 404-H --Workshopped
2009-10-01 Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-07-29 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0221 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
H0323 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
H0893 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA)
S0168 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0244 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0324 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0326 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0328 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0374 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S0592 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation
S0934 (Similar To) 2010-01-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1144 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S0448 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
S2514 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0316304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032227Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback