WY SF0025 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; amending enforcement provisions; providing for the possession and care of impounded animals as a result of charges; amending provisions relating to the cost and disposition of impounded animals; providing alternative processes as specified; providing for an expedited court hearing; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Animal impound proceedings - bond and disposition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Adopted SF0025JC001: 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Adopted SF0025JC001: 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-28-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Adopted SF0025JC001: 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-28-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Assigned Chapter Number 119 | |
2021-04-06 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0059 | |
2021-04-02 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0059 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0059 |
2021-04-02 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0059 | |
2021-03-30 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Concur:Failed 1-28-1-0-0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0 |
2021-03-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2021-03-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-18 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2021-03-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-08 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-03 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S01 - Judiciary |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-01-27 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-30 | Bill Number Assigned |