WV HB5623 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to absenteee voting
Title
Relating to absentee voting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 394) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 394) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-12 | House | To Judiciary |
2024-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB772 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 3 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |