UT HCR023 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Promoting Continued Access and Recreation on Lands Managed by the Bureau of Land Management
Title
Concurrent Resolution Promoting Continued Access and Recreation on Lands Managed by the Bureau of Land Management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 62 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-09 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-03-06 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-06 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-06 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-03-06 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2017-02-24 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-16 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-16 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |