US SB151 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on December 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-105. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pallone-Thune TRACED Act Pallone-Thune Telephone Robocall Abuse Criminal Enforcement and Deterrence Act This bill implements a forfeiture penalty for violations (with or without intent) of the prohibition on certain robocalls. The bill also removes an annual reporting requirement for enforcement relating to unsolicited facsimile advertisements. The bill requires voice service providers to develop call authentication technologies. The Federal Communications Commission (FCC) shall promulgate rules establishing when a provider may block a voice call based on information provided by the call authentication framework, but also must establish a process to permit a calling party adversely affected by the framework to verify the authenticity of their calls. The FCC shall also initiate a rulemaking to help protect a subscriber from receiving unwanted calls or texts from a caller using an unauthenticated number. This bill requires the Department of Justice and the FCC to assemble an interagency working group to study and report to Congress on the enforcement of the prohibition of certain robocalls. Specifically, the working group will look into how to better enforce against robocalls by examining issues like the types of laws, policies, or constraints that could be inhibiting enforcement. The bill requires the FCC to initiate a proceeding to determine whether its policies regarding access to number resources could be modified to help reduce access to numbers by potential robocall violators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pallone-Thune TRACED Act Pallone-Thune Telephone Robocall Abuse Criminal Enforcement and Deterrence Act

Sponsors

Sen. John Thune [R-SD]Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA]Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS]Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO]
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL]
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND]Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI]Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL]
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE]Sen. Krysten Sinema [D-AZ]Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND]Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA]Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC]Sen. Angus King [I-ME]
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT]Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS]Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM]
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV]Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI]Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL]Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA]
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE]Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ]Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH]Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT]
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV]Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY]Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS]
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX]Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA]Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI]Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ]
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI]Sen. John Boozman [R-AR]Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN]Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD]
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD]Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS]Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR]
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO]Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA]Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH]Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR]Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC]Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID]
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV]Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO]
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]Sen. David Perdue [R-GA]Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM]Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR]
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY]Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA]Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK]Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT]Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK]Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT]Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA]
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC]Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA]Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ]Sen. James Risch [R-ID]
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI]Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA]Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA]
Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL]Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY]Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO]Sen. Richard Shelby [R-AL]
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA]

Roll Calls

2019-12-04 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 647 (Y: 417 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Passed Senate with an amendment RC# 127 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-30HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-105. (TXT | PDF)
2019-12-30HouseSigned by President.
2019-12-20HousePresented to President.
2019-12-19HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-12-19HouseSenate agreed to the House amendment to S. 151 by Voice Vote.
2019-12-19HouseMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7177)
2019-12-05HouseMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
2019-12-04HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-12-04HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 3 (Roll no. 647). (text: CR H9235-9239)
2019-12-04HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9246-9247)
2019-12-04HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-12-04HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 151.
2019-12-04HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9235-9245)
2019-12-04HouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-05-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
2019-05-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-05-24HouseReceived in the House.
2019-05-23SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-05-23SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 1. Record Vote Number: 127.
2019-05-23SenateThe committee substitute agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3075-3076)
2019-05-23SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3075-3077)
2019-05-21SenateAn errata sheet on written report No. 116-41 was printed.
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 94.
2019-05-21SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-41.
2019-04-03SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-01-16SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB1602 (Same As) 2019-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB721 (Related) 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2015 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB3780 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB3264 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB3325 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB3434 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
SB819 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback