US HB1602 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Implements a forfeiture penalty for violations (with or without intent) of the prohibition on certain robocalls. The bill also removes an annual reporting requirement for enforcement relating to unsolicited facsimile advertisements. The bill requires voice service providers to develop call authentication technologies. The Federal Communications Commission (FCC) shall promulgate rules establishing when a provider may block a voice call based on information provided by the call authentication framework, but also must establish a process to permit a calling party adversely affected by the framework to verify the authenticity of their calls. The FCC shall also initiate a rulemaking to help protect a subscriber from receiving unwanted calls or texts from a caller using an unauthenticated number. requires the Department of Justice and the FCC to assemble an interagency working group to study and report to Congress on the enforcement of the prohibition of certain robocalls. Specifically, the working group will look into how to better enforce against robocalls by examining issues like the types of laws, policies, or constraints that could be inhibiting enforcement. The bill requires the FCC to initiate a proceeding to determine whether its policies regarding access to number resources could be modified to help reduce access to numbers by potential robocall violators.
Title
TRACED Act Telephone Robocall Abuse Criminal Enforcement and Deterrence Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB151 (Same As) 2019-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-105. (TXT | PDF)
HB2015 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB721 (Related) 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2015 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB721 (Related) 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Marketing and advertising
Right of privacy
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Marketing and advertising
Right of privacy
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1602/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1602/BILLS-116hr1602ih.pdf |