US HB721 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-7)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Spam Calls Task Force Act of 2019 This bill requires the Department of Justice to assemble an interagency working group to study and report to Congress on the enforcement of the prohibition of certain robocalls. Specifically, the working group will look into how to better enforce against robocalls by examining issues like the types of laws, policies, or constraints that could be inhibiting enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Spam Calls Task Force Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
2019-01-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1602 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB2015 (Related) 2019-04-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB151 (Related) 2019-05-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback