US HB3780 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission to establish the Hospital Robocall Protection Group to develop best practices for combating unlawful robocalls made to hospitals and to devise strategies for hospitals to protect themselves from such calls.
Title
Protecting Patients and Doctors from Unlawful Robocalls Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-07-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3375 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
SB151 (Related) 2019-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-105. (TXT | PDF)
SB151 (Related) 2019-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-105. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health facilities and institutions
Hospital care
Intergovernmental relations
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Advisory bodies
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health facilities and institutions
Hospital care
Intergovernmental relations
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3780/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3780/BILLS-116hr3780ih.pdf |