US HR716 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2119) to amend the Family Violence Prevention and Services Act to make improvements; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3110) to amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to expand access to breastfeeding accommodations in the workplace, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3992) to amend the Age Discrimination in Employment Act of 1967 to prohibit employers from limiting, segregating, or classifying applicants for employment; relating to consideration of the Senate amendment to the House amendment to the bill (S. 1301) to provide for the publication by the Secretary of Health and Human Services of physical activity recommendations for Americans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2119) to amend the Family Violence Prevention and Services Act to make improvements; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3110) to amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to expand access to breastfeeding accommodations in the workplace, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3992) to amend the Age Discrimination in Employment Act of 1967 to prohibit employers from limiting, segregating, or classifying applicants for employment; relating to consideration of the Senate amendment to the House amendment to the bill (S. 1301) to provide for the publication by the Secretary of Health and Human Services of physical activity recommendations for Americans; and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-12 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 219 N: 206 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-10-12HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 206 (Roll no. 315). (text: CR H5613-5614)
2021-10-12HouseThe previous question was ordered without objection.
2021-10-12HouseDEBATE - The House continued with debate on H. Res. 716.
2021-10-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 716.
2021-10-12HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: H5613-5628)
2021-10-12HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 38.
2021-10-12HouseThe resolution provides that H. Res. 188, agreed to March 8, 2021, is amended by striking "October 27, 2021" each place it appears and inserting "November 18, 2021.
2021-10-12HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-137, by Mr. McGovern.

Same As/Similar To

HB2119 (Related) 2021-10-12 - Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 716 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2119, H.R. 3110 and H.R. 3992. The resolution provides that H. Res. 188, agreed to March 8, 2021, is amended by striking "October 27, 2021" each place it appears and inserting "November 18, 2021.
HR716 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3110 (Related) 2021-10-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3992 (Related) 2021-10-12 - Rule H. Res. 716 passed House.

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback