US HB3992 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Age Discrimination in Employment Act of 1967 to prohibit employers from limiting, segregating, or classifying applicants for employment.
Title
POJA Act of 2021 Protect Older Job Applicants Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-04 - House - On passage (Y: 224 N: 200 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - On agreeing to the Pappas amendment (A002) H.Amdt.137 (Y: 225 N: 201 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - On agreeing to the Keller amendment (A003) H.Amdt.138 (Y: 197 N: 228 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-11-04 - House - On agreeing to the Pappas amendment (A002) H.Amdt.137 (Y: 225 N: 201 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - On agreeing to the Keller amendment (A003) H.Amdt.138 (Y: 197 N: 228 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2021-11-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-04 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 224 - 200 (Roll no. 358). |
2021-11-04 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-11-04 | House | H.Amdt.138 On agreeing to the Keller amendment (A003) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 197 - 228 (Roll no. 357). |
2021-11-04 | House | H.Amdt.137 On agreeing to the Pappas amendment (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 225 - 201 (Roll no. 356). |
2021-11-04 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6193-6195) |
2021-11-03 | House | Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule XIX, further consideration of H.R. 3992 is postponed. |
2021-11-03 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Keller amendment No. 2, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Keller demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2021-11-03 | House | H.Amdt.138 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule. |
2021-11-03 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 716, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Keller amendment No. 2. |
2021-11-03 | House | H.Amdt.138 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Keller. (consideration: CR H6166-6167; text: CR H6166) |
2021-11-03 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Pappas amendment No. 1, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Good demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2021-11-03 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 716, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Pappas amendment No. 1. |
2021-11-03 | House | The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule. |
2021-11-03 | House | H.Amdt.137 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Pappas. (consideration: CR H6164-6165; text: CR H6164) |
2021-11-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3992. |
2021-11-03 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2119, H.R. 3110 and H.R. 3992. The resolution provides that H. Res. 188, agreed to March 8, 2021, is amended by striking "October 27, 2021" each place it appears and inserting "November 18, 2021. |
2021-11-03 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 716. (consideration: CR H6158-6167; text: CR H6158) |
2021-10-12 | House | Rule H. Res. 716 passed House. |
2021-10-12 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 716 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2119, H.R. 3110 and H.R. 3992. The resolution provides that H. Res. 188, agreed to March 8, 2021, is amended by striking "October 27, 2021" each place it appears and inserting "November 18, 2021. |
2021-09-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 91. |
2021-09-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 117-127. |
2021-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 19. |
2021-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-23 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3058) |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-06-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR716 (Related) 2021-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.