US HB3110 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-26 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 155.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-26 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 155.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to expand access to breastfeeding accommodations in the workplace, and for other purposes.
Title
Providing Urgent Maternal Protections for Nursing Mothers Act PUMP for Nursing Mothers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-22 - House - On passage (Y: 276 N: 149 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-10-22 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 200 N: 224 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-10-22 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 200 N: 224 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | Senate | Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 155. |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2021-10-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-22 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 276 - 149 (Roll no. 331). (text: CR H5798) |
2021-10-22 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 200 - 224 (Roll no. 330). |
2021-10-22 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2021-10-22 | House | Ms. Van Duyne moved to recommit to the Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-10-22 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-10-22 | House | H.Amdt.132 On agreeing to the Strickland amendment (A003) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2021-10-22 | House | H.Amdt.132 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule. |
2021-10-22 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 716, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Strickland amendment No. 2. |
2021-10-22 | House | H.Amdt.132 Amendment (A003) offered by Ms. Strickland. (consideration: CR H5812-5814; text: CR H5812) |
2021-10-22 | House | H.Amdt.131 On agreeing to the Ross amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2021-10-22 | House | H.Amdt.131 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule. |
2021-10-22 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 716, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Ross amendment No. 1. |
2021-10-22 | House | H.Amdt.131 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Ross. (consideration: CR H5810-5812; text: CR H5810) |
2021-10-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3110. |
2021-10-22 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2119, H.R. 3110 and H.R. 3992. The resolution provides that H. Res. 188, agreed to March 8, 2021, is amended by striking "October 27, 2021" each place it appears and inserting "November 18, 2021. |
2021-10-22 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 716. (consideration: CR H5798-5816; text: CR H5814) |
2021-10-12 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 716 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2119, H.R. 3110 and H.R. 3992. The resolution provides that H. Res. 188, agreed to March 8, 2021, is amended by striking "October 27, 2021" each place it appears and inserting "November 18, 2021. |
2021-07-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 75. |
2021-07-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 117-102. |
2021-05-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 19. |
2021-05-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-05-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1658 (Same As) 2021-05-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65.
HR716 (Related) 2021-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4297 (Related) 2021-07-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR716 (Related) 2021-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4297 (Related) 2021-07-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.