US HB2119 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 80-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Family Violence Prevention and Services Act to make improvements.
Title
Family Violence Prevention and Services Improvement Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-26 - House - On passage (Y: 228 N: 200 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A003) H.Amdt.135 (Y: 175 N: 250 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-10-26 - House - On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A002) H.Amdt.134 (Y: 238 N: 189 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A003) H.Amdt.135 (Y: 175 N: 250 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-10-26 - House - On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A002) H.Amdt.134 (Y: 238 N: 189 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156. |
2021-10-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-26 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 200 (Roll no. 336). |
2021-10-26 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-10-26 | House | H.Amdt.135 On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A003) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 175 - 250 (Roll no. 335). |
2021-10-26 | House | H.Amdt.134 On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 238 - 189 (Roll no. 334). |
2021-10-26 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: H5908-5911) |
2021-10-26 | House | Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the House proceeded with further consideration of H.R. 2119. |
2021-10-26 | House | Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on H.R. 2119 is postponed. |
2021-10-26 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Scott (VA) en bloc No. 2, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Foxx demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2021-10-26 | House | H.Amdt.135 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule. |
2021-10-26 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 716, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Scott (VA) en bloc No. 2. |
2021-10-26 | House | H.Amdt.135 Amendments en bloc (A003) offered by Mr. Scott (VA). (consideration: CR H5906-5908, H5909-5910; text: CR H5906-5907) |
2021-10-26 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Scott (VA) en bloc No. 1, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Clyde demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2021-10-26 | House | H.Amdt.134 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule. |
2021-10-26 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 716, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Scott (VA) en bloc No. 1. |
2021-10-26 | House | H.Amdt.134 Amendments en bloc (A002) offered by Mr. Scott (VA). (consideration: CR H5904-5906, H5908-5909; text: CR H5904) |
2021-10-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2119. |
2021-10-26 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2119, H.R. 3110 and H.R. 3992. The resolution provides that H. Res. 188, agreed to March 8, 2021, is amended by striking "October 27, 2021" each place it appears and inserting "November 18, 2021. |
2021-10-26 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 716. (consideration: H5885-5908; text: CR H5885-5895) |
2021-10-12 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 716 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2119, H.R. 3110 and H.R. 3992. The resolution provides that H. Res. 188, agreed to March 8, 2021, is amended by striking "October 27, 2021" each place it appears and inserting "November 18, 2021. |
2021-09-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 90. |
2021-09-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 117-126. |
2021-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 20. |
2021-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1275 (Same As) 2021-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 108.
HR716 (Related) 2021-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR716 (Related) 2021-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.