US HCR177 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-28 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-28 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the designation of Celebrate Safe Communities Week and for Crime Prevention Month. Commends the efforts of local law enforcement agencies and their community partners in the fight against crime. Encourages the National Sheriffs' Association and the National Crime Prevention Council to continue to promote action to reduce crime and build safer communities. Encourages government agencies, civil groups, schools, businesses, and youth organizations to educate the public, showcase their accomplishments, and explore new partnerships during Crime Prevention Month.
Title
Raising the awareness of the need for crime prevention in communities across the country and expressing support for designation of October 1, 2009, through October 3, 2009, as "Celebrate Safe Communities" Week, and October as "Crime Prevention Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Anh Cao [R-LA] | Rep. Ben Chandler [D-KY] |
Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D-IL] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Gerlach [R-PA] | Rep. Tim Holden [D-PA] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Frank Kratovil [D-MD] | Rep. Betsy Markey [D-CO] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Dennis Moore [D-KS] |
Rep. Sue Myrick [R-NC] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Ike Skelton [D-MO] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Bart Stupak [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-28 | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. | |
2009-10-28 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-10-28 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H12004) | |
2009-10-28 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 177. | |
2009-10-28 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H12004-12006) | |
2009-10-28 | Mr. Cohen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-08-19 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. | |
2009-07-31 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SR302 (Related) 2009-10-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10118; text as passed Senate: CR S10118; text of measure as introduced: CR S10113)
HR1666 (Related) 2010-12-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HR1666 (Related) 2010-12-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.