US HR1666 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the designation of Crime Prevention Month and participation in Celebrate Safe Communities during Crime Prevention Month. Commends the efforts of local law enforcement agencies and their community partners in the fight against crime. Congratulates McGruff the Crime Dog during his 30th anniversary year. Encourages: (1) the National Crime Prevention Council and the National Sheriffs' Association to continue to promote Celebrate Safe Communities and individual and collective action to reduce crime and build safer communities; and (2) government agencies, civic groups, schools, businesses, and youth organizations to educate the public, showcase their accomplishments, and explore new partnerships during Crime Prevention Month.
Title
Expressing support for designation of October 2010 as "Crime Prevention Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Boswell [D-IA] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Lee Terry [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-20 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. | |
2010-09-28 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR177 (Related) 2009-10-28 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SR302 (Related) 2009-10-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10118; text as passed Senate: CR S10118; text of measure as introduced: CR S10113)
SR302 (Related) 2009-10-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10118; text as passed Senate: CR S10118; text of measure as introduced: CR S10113)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-resolution/1666/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hres1666/BILLS-111hres1666ih.pdf |