US HB5360 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Pending: House Nutrition Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Pending: House Nutrition Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Welfare Reform and Upward Mobility Act This bill requires the President to include in the annual budget proposal the total level of means-tested welfare spending by the federal, state, and local governments for the most recent fiscal year for which such data is available, and estimated levels for the current and 10 ensuing fiscal years. For each of FY2018-FY2028 each state that receives means-tested welfare spending by the federal government shall report annually to the Congressional Budget Office on the total amount of such spending by the state for the fiscal year. The Congressional Budget Act of 1974 is amended to define means-tested welfare spending as spending for any federal program designed specifically to give assistance or benefits exclusively to low-income Americans, including certain targeted community and economic development programs, unless they: are based on earned eligibility, are not need-based, are designed exclusively or primarily for veterans of military service, or offer universal or near universal eligibility to the working population and their dependents. The bill specifies federal cash assistance, medical, food, housing, energy, education training, child care, services, and community development programs deemed means-tested welfare spending, as well as federal programs that are not so deemed, including Social Security Disability Insurance, Medicare, unemployment insurance, Social Security retirement and survivor benefits, and military service veterans programs. The refundable portion of certain tax credits shall also be means-tested welfare spending, as well as the refundable portion of the premium and out-of-pocket health care subsidies to be paid under the Patient Protection and Affordable Health Care Act. The Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 is amended to specify, as an additional purpose for the supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP), promoting prosperous self-sufficiency, which means the ability of households to maintain an income above the poverty-level without services and benefits from the federal government. The bill revises work eligibility requirements under SNAP As a condition of receiving SNAP funds, a state agency shall operate a work activation program for adults with dependent children. Part A (Temporary Assistance for Needy Families) (TANF) of title IV of the Social Security Act is amended to create the work preparation program for TANF families. The bill eliminates separate participation rate requirements for two-parent families. A family with a child under age 6 shall be deemed to meet work participation requirements if any parent is engaged in work for at least 20 hours per week. No federal funds shall be made available to carry out any means-tested housing program, but states may receive grants to fund their own housing programs. The bill prohibits funding for abortions and for health benefits that cover abortion, including certain tax credits, except where the pregnancy results from rape or incest or in certain other health cases.
Title
Welfare Reform and Upward Mobility Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition. |
2016-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources. |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-05-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1025 (Related) 2015-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
HB2383 (Related) 2015-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
HB2969 (Related) 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
SB219 (Related) 2015-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2383 (Related) 2015-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
HB2969 (Related) 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
SB219 (Related) 2015-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Abortion
Appropriations
Budget process
Child care and development
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Employment and training programs
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Food assistance and relief
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Housing and community development funding
Income tax credits
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
State and local government operations
Appropriations
Budget process
Child care and development
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Employment and training programs
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Food assistance and relief
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Housing and community development funding
Income tax credits
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/5360/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr5360/BILLS-114hr5360ih.pdf |