US HB1025 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Pending: House Nutrition Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Pending: House Nutrition Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SNAP Work Opportunities Act of 2015 This bill amends the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 to exempt Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP, formerly known as the food stamp program) beneficiaries from work requirements if they are not offered a position in a state job training or workfare program.
Title
SNAP Work Opportunities Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition. |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2015-02-24 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E239-240) |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2420 (Related) 2015-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB5215 (Related) 2016-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
HB5360 (Related) 2016-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
HB5215 (Related) 2016-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
HB5360 (Related) 2016-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Employment and training programs
Food assistance and relief
Poverty and welfare assistance
Employment and training programs
Food assistance and relief
Poverty and welfare assistance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1025/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1025/BILLS-114hr1025ih.pdf |