US HB2969 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TANF Marriage Penalty Elimination Act This bill amends part A (Temporary Assistance for Needy Families) (TANF) of title IV of the Social Security Act with respect to mandatory work requirements to repeal the separate participation rate for two-parent families receiving TANF assistance.
Title
TANF Marriage Penalty Elimination Act
Sponsors
Rep. George Holding [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2015-07-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources. |
2015-07-08 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-07-08 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-07-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-07-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5360 (Related) 2016-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Subjects
Employment and training programs
Marriage and family status
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
Marriage and family status
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2969/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2969/BILLS-114hr2969ih.pdf |