US HB3 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 106-1)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - House Committee on Education and Labor Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 9, 2019.
Hearing: Dec 10 @ 3:00 pm in H-313 CAPITOL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lower Drug Costs Now Act of 2019 This bill establishes several programs and requirements relating to the prices of prescription drugs. In particular, the bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to negotiate prices for certain drugs (current law prohibits the CMS from doing so). Specifically, the CMS must negotiate maximum prices for (1) insulin products; and (2) at least 25 single source, brand name drugs that do not have generic competition and that are among the 125 drugs that account for the greatest national spending or the 125 drugs that account for the greatest spending under the Medicare prescription drug benefit and Medicare Advantage (MA). The negotiated prices must be offered under Medicare and MA, and may also be offered under private health insurance unless the insurer opts out. The negotiated maximum price may not exceed (1) 120% of the average price in Australia, Canada, France, Germany, Japan, and the United Kingdom; or (2) if such information is not available, 85% of the U.S. average manufacturer price. Drug manufacturers that fail to comply with the bill's negotiation requirements are subject to civil and tax penalties. The bill also makes a series of additional changes to Medicare prescription drug coverage and pricing. Among other things, the bill (1) requires drug manufacturers to issue rebates to the CMS for covered drugs that cost $100 or more and for which the average manufacturer price increases faster than inflation; and (2) reduces the annual out-of-pocket spending threshold, and eliminates beneficiary cost-sharing above this threshold, under the Medicare prescription drug benefit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lower Drug Costs Now Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-06HouseHouse Committee on Education and Labor Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 9, 2019.
2019-12-06HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-324, Part II.
2019-12-06HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-324, Part I.
2019-10-22HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 17.
2019-10-22HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 21.
2019-10-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-25HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-09-20HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-09-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-09-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-09-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-09-19HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4619 (Related) 2019-10-08 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4649 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8607)
HB4663 (Related) 2019-10-11 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback