US HB3398 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 211.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 211.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide low-income individuals with opportunities to enter and follow a career pathway in the health professions, to extend and expand demonstration projects, and for other purposes.
Title
Pathways to Health Careers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 211. |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-265. |
2019-10-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 16. |
2019-10-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-06-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3336 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3338 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3339 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3343 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3344 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3346 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3347 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
HB3337 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3340 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3756 (Related) 2019-07-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3376 (Related) 2020-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3338 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3339 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3343 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3344 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3346 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3347 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
HB3337 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3340 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3756 (Related) 2019-07-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3376 (Related) 2020-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Adult education and literacy
Child care and development
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Health and Human Services
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Sex and reproductive health
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Child care and development
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Health and Human Services
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Sex and reproductive health
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation