AL SB23 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Food Products, manufacture and distribution of meat from cultured animal cells prohibited

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food Products, manufacture and distribution of meat from cultured animal cells prohibited

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 838 (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 837 8XSXHFH-1 (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Williams substitution 3USCVVV-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-08SenateEnacted
2024-05-08SenateEnacted
2024-04-30HouseSignature Requested
2024-04-30SenateEnrolled
2024-04-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2024-04-30SenateReady to Enroll
2024-04-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 838
2024-04-25HouseMotion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 837 8XSXHFH-1
2024-04-25HouseHealth Engrossed Substitute Offered 8XSXHFH-1
2024-04-25HouseThird Reading in Second House
2024-04-23HouseCarried Over to the Call of the Chair
2024-03-06HouseCommittee Engrossed Substitute Adopted 8XSXHFH-1
2024-03-06HouseCommittee Amendment Adopted JGHKNNY-1
2024-03-06HouseRead for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
2024-03-06HouseReported Out of Committee Second House
2024-02-21SenateEngrossed
2024-02-20HousePending House Health
2024-02-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Health
2024-02-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 48
2024-02-15SenateWilliams motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 47 3USCVVV-1
2024-02-15SenateAC&F Substitute Offered 3USCVVV-1
2024-02-15SenateThird Reading in House of Origin
2024-02-14Senate 3USCVVV-1
2024-02-14Senate 3USCVVV-1
2024-02-14SenateRead for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
2024-02-14SenateReported Out of Committee House of Origin
2024-02-06SenatePending Senate Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
2024-02-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
2024-02-01SenatePrefiled

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/SB23-int.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/SB23-eng.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/SB23-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/3USCVVV-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/8XSXHFH-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/JGHKNNY-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/FiscalNotes/FN-QP68155-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/FiscalNotes/FN-QP68155-2.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/FiscalNotes/FN-QP68155-3.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2024RS/FiscalNotes/FN-QP68155-4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc46
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc47
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc48
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc836
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc837
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc838

Bill Comments

feedback