US HB4665 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 304.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 304.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands Medicare coverage to include eyeglasses, contact lenses, and vision services, in accordance with specified limitations. Covered services include routine eye examinations and contact lens fittings.
Title
Medicare Vision Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 304. |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-327, Part II. |
2019-12-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-327, Part I. |
2019-10-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-17 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-09-25 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Health Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
Subjects
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare