US HB4618 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 302.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 302.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands Medicare coverage to include hearing aids and hearing rehabilitation and treatment services, in accordance with specified limitations.
Title
Medicare Hearing Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 302. |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-326, Part II. |
2019-12-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-326, Part I. |
2019-10-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-17 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2019-10-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-09-25 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Health Prior to Introduction and Referral. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Medicare
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Medicare